Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Whiles , Troy W, filed a(n) Cc Cs Motion To Modify case in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts MO-Knox with Thomas P. Redington presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2018 |
CategoryCc Cs Motion To Modify |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Knox |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing/Trial Cancelled | |
October 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Clerk contacted the DeCoster Law Firm and was advised that Troy Whiles had contacted them about this GAL fee. They will take payments from Mr. Whiles. Scheduled For: 11/10/2020; 1:00 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Clerk handed Notice of Entry to Troy Whiles in the office with a new court date. KH |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Review Scheduled | |
September 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Because of the Missouri Supreme Court's Order, of 3/22/20 and later extension, and the Circuit Judge's Order suspending Court appearances in most cases, for health and safety concerns, this case is continued to 11/10/20 at 1:00 pm for review and/or re-setting. TPR Hearing Continued From: 10/06/2020; 1:00 PM Case Review |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled GAL FEE OF $250.00 DUE FROM TROY WHILES PER ORDER ON 6/11/2019 Counsel of Record Notified Via Missouri Courts Electronic Filing System. Associated Entries: 10/29/2020 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled Clerk contacted the DeCoster Law Firm and was advised that Troy Whiles had contacted them about this GAL fee. They will take payments from Mr. Whiles. \n Scheduled For: 11/10/2020; 1:00 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Review Scheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.