Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Farha , Russell Richard, against Ritter , Tabatha, in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts with ALBERTY, WILLIAM E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALBERTY, WILLIAM E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2010 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
|
Judgment Entered
Date: July 27, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed A F/S COPY OF SATISFACTION MAILED TO DFT AND TO APLT DAVID KOZENY. Filed By: DAVID J KOZENY |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note APLT. DAVID J. KOZENY ADVISED THAT THIS COURT ALSO HAS A TRANSCRIPT JUDGMENT ON THIS MATTER THAT HE MUST SATISFY. |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request Filed REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT JUDGMENT FILED CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT DELIVERED TO CIRCUIT DIVISION Filed By: PAMELA PALMER PATTON |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered PRINCIPAL $1,259.94, INTEREST $32.62, TOTAL $1,292.56 PLUS COURT COSTS. JUDGMENT SHALL BEAR INTEREST AT THE RATE OF 9.00% PER ANNUM. PLT DISMISSED ITS CAUSE OF ACTION AS TO COUNT 2 ONLY. EXECUTION STAYED FOR PAYMENTS PER AGREEMENT. Filed By: TABATHA RITTER |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Consent Judgment | |
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note A F/S COPY OF JUDGMENT HANDED TO APLT AND DFT IN OPEN COURT. |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Held PLT BY ATTY FARHA. DFT IN PERSON. CONSENT JUDGMENT ENTERED. SEE WRITTEN JUDGMENT. WEA Filed By: WILLIAM E ALBERTY \n Scheduled For: 07/27/2010; 10:30 AM ; WILLIAM E ALBERTY; Knox |
|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 10-ADSM-383; Served To - RITTER, TABATHA; Server - SO KNOX COUNTY-EDINA; Served Date - 04-JUN-10; Served Time - 11:12:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served NOTICE MAILED TO ATTY. IRWIN JAMES FRANKEL |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 07/27/2010 - Court Trial Held PLT BY ATTY FARHA. DFT IN PERSON. CONSENT JUDGMENT ENTERED. SEE WRITTEN JUDGMENT. WEA \n Scheduled For: 07/27/2010; 10:30 AM ; WILLIAM E ALBERTY; Knox |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 10-ADSM-383, for RITTER, TABATHA.: SUMMONS W/COPY OF PET. ATTACHED DELIVERED TO THE KCSD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.