Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lampasi , Robert Glenn, filed a(n) Cc Pers Injury-Vehicular case against Sowell , Caleb, Hampton , John, represented by Bischoff , Alison K., in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, MO, . Jefferson County, MO Superior Courts MO-Jefferson with Vic Melenbrink presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2016 |
CategoryCc Pers Injury-Vehicular |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJefferson County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Jefferson |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Filed CAUSE CALLED, ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT APPEARS, PLAINTIFF FAILS TO APPEAR. CAUSE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE SO ORDERED; VICTOR MELENBRINK, CIRCUIT JUDGE DIV. FIVE |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Associated Entries: 01/26/2018 - Case Mgmt Conf Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 03/23/2018; 9:00 AM ; VICTOR JOSEPH MELENBRINK; Jefferson |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Withdrawing Attorney: | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ENTRY MAILED TO ROBERT LAMPASI |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Mgmt Conf Scheduled Associated Entries: 03/23/2018 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice \n Scheduled For: 03/23/2018; 9:00 AM ; VICTOR JOSEPH MELENBRINK; Jefferson |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Filed CAUSE SET FOR CMC 3-23-18 9:00 AM SO ORDERED; VICTOR MELENBRINK, CIRCUIT JUDGE DIV. FIVE |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response Filed MOTION SET FOR HEARING 1-26-18 @ 9:00 AM. IF THE COURT RECEIVES EITHER THE SIGNED CONSENT OF PLAINTIFF OR AN ENTRY BY ANOTHER ATTORNEY, THE MOTION WILL BE GRANTED WITHOUT NEED FOR A HEARING JUDGE VIC MELENBRINK Associated Entries: 01/03/2018 - Motion to Withdraw MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF; PROPOSED ORDER, MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF; PROPOSED ORDER, MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: THOMAS CHARLES RICH \n On Behalf Of: ROBERT GLENN LAMPASI \n Associated Entries: 01/08/2018 - Response Filed MOTION SET FOR HEARING 1-26-18 @ 9:00 AM. IF THE COURT RECEIVES EITHER THE SIGNED CONSENT OF PLAINTIFF OR AN ENTRY BY ANOTHER ATTORNEY, THE MOTION WILL BE GRANTED WITHOUT NEED FOR A HEARING JUDGE VIC MELENBRINK |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Pre-trial Conference Scheduled | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Scheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.