Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Oak Hill South Homeowners Association, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against Patterson-Peters-Dill Dev. Inc., in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MO, . Jackson County, MO Superior Courts MO-Jackson - Independence with PHILLIPS, JENNIFER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2023 |
CategoryCc Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJackson County, MO |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Filing Court HouseMO-Jackson - Independence |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Mgmt Conf Held | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Granted/Sustained | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Judmt/Dec Dis Filed | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Order of Publication | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.