Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
World Acceptance Corp Of Missouri, filed a(n) case represented by Myers , Edward J., against Barney , Jessica Marie, in the jurisdiction of Howard County, MO, . Howard County, MO Superior Courts with GEBHARDT, MASON ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationHoward County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice No appearances. Cause dismissed without prejudice. Associated Entries: 10/23/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled to 1-15-20 at 9:00 a.m. per request of Plaintiff. \n Associated Entries: 10/23/2019 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 01/15/2020; 9:00 AM ; MASON ROBERT GEBHARDT; Howard |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Denied MTC overruled due to time standards. Cause has been pending since June of 2019. Cause remains set for service review/dismissal on 1-15-20 at 9:00 a.m. Associated Entries: 01/13/2020 - Motion for Continuance motion for continuance; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
motion for continuance; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: DAVID REID GAMACHE \n On Behalf Of: WORLD ACCEPTANCE CORP OF MISSOURI \n Associated Entries: 01/13/2020 - Motion Denied MTC overruled due to time standards. Cause has been pending since June of 2019. Cause remains set for service review/dismissal on 1-15-20 at 9:00 a.m. |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
motion for continuance; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: DAVID REID GAMACHE \n On Behalf Of: WORLD ACCEPTANCE CORP OF MISSOURI |
|
October 23, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/15/2020 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice No appearances. Cause dismissed without prejudice. \n Scheduled For: 01/15/2020; 9:00 AM ; MASON ROBERT GEBHARDT; Howard |
|
October 23, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled to 1-15-20 at 9:00 a.m. per request of Plaintiff. Hearing Continued From: 10/30/2019; 9:00 AM Hearing |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Non-Est Document ID - 19-AASM-293; Served To - BARNEY, JESSICA MARIE; Server - SO HOWARD COUNTY - FAYETTE; Served Date - 11-OCT-19; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Non-est |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Issued Document ID: 19-AASM-293, for BARNEY, JESSICA MARIE. |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Requested ALIAS. Filed By: EDWARD J. MYERS \n On Behalf Of: WORLD ACCEPTANCE CORP OF MISSOURI |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Filed By: EDWARD J. MYERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.