Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carrington Mortgage Services, Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Kerekanich , Adam Steven, against Doe, A K A Unknown Tenant Occupant , John, Decker , Tina Mae, Decker , Norman T, in the jurisdiction of Howard County, MO, . Howard County, MO Superior Courts with GEBHARDT, MASON ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationHoward County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Associated Entries: 04/17/2018 - Return Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 05/09/2018; 9:00 AM ; MASON ROBERT GEBHARDT; Howard |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Withdrawn Document ID - 18-SM99-7; Served To - DOE, A/K/A UNKNOWN TENANT/OCCUPANT, JOHN; Server - KEREKANICH, ADAM STEVEN; Served Date - 03-MAY-18; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Other; Reason Description - Recalled/Withdrawn |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Dismissal without Prejudice. Filed By: ADAM STEVEN KEREKANICH \n On Behalf Of: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Withdrawn Document ID - 18-SM99-6; Served To - DECKER, TINA MAE; Server - KEREKANICH, ADAM STEVEN; Served Date - 03-MAY-18; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Other; Reason Description - Recalled/Withdrawn |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Withdrawn Document ID - 18-SM99-5; Served To - DECKER, NORMAN T; Server - KEREKANICH, ADAM STEVEN; Served Date - 03-MAY-18; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Other; Reason Description - Recalled/Withdrawn |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Return Scheduled Associated Entries: 05/03/2018 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice \n Scheduled For: 05/09/2018; 9:00 AM ; MASON ROBERT GEBHARDT; Howard |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Unlawful Detain Document ID: 18-SM99-5, for DECKER, NORMAN T. |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Unlawful Detain Document ID: 18-SM99-7, for DOE, A/K/A UNKNOWN TENANT/OCCUPANT, JOHN. |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Unlawful Detain Document ID: 18-SM99-6, for DECKER, TINA MAE. |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Post Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.