Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Division Of Employment Security- Bpc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Youngblood , Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Howard County, MO, . Howard County, MO Superior Courts MO-Howard.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2015 |
CategoryCc Transcript Judgment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHoward County, MO |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseMO-Howard |
Case Outcome TypeOther Final Disposition |
Judgment Entered
Date: October 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sub Counsel by Auto Script Bart Matanic enters his appearance as attorney of record for the Missouri Department of Labor and substitutes his appearance for Mandolin Roberson pursuant to correspondence dated December 27, 2018 to the Office of State Courts Administrator requesting the substitution. |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sub Counsel by Auto Script Mandolin Roberson enters her appearance as attorney of record for the Missouri Department of Labor and substitutes her appearance for Meaghan Forck pursuant to correspondence dated September 4, 2018 to the Office of State Courts Administrator requesting the substitution. |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sub Counsel by Auto Script Meaghan Forck enters her appearance as attorney of record for the Missouri Department of Labor and substitutes her appearance for Ninion S. Riley pursuant to correspondence dated April 17, 2018 to the Office of State Courts Administrator requesting the substitution. |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Filed By: NINION S RILEY |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed CERTIFICATE RELEASE. Filed By: NINION S RILEY |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered CERTIFICATE OF ASSESSMENT OF OVERPAID BENEFITS. Filed in Transcript Book 8 Page 13. released in transcript book 8 page 159 On Behalf Of: DIVISION OF EMPLOYMENT SECURITY- BPC |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Info Sheet eFiling Filed By: NINION S RILEY |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Transcript Judgment Filed | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Other Final Disposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.