Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Benedix , Erin Lynn, filed a(n) case against Benedix , Scott Adam, in the jurisdiction of Hickory County, MO, . Hickory County, MO Superior Courts with HACKETT, JAMES ANDREW presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationHickory County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Records Filed Request for Information from Court Record; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Judgment, Form 14, Affidavits of medical support, parenting plan emailed to K. Kilgore @ dss.mo.gov this date. tf |
|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Filed Correspondence to Erin L Benedix. Filed By: HAROLD FLOYD GLASS II \n On Behalf Of: SCOTT ADAM BENEDIX |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Sound Recording Log Sheet | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment on Dissolution | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Petitioner appears in person. Respondent appears in person. Respondent's attorney, Harold Glass, appears in person. All parties in appearance announce ready for hearing. Hearing held on the record. Upon the evidence adduced the court finds: This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter and the parties in this action. More than thirty (30) days have elapsed since the filing of the petition herein. Petitioner has been a resident of the State of Missouri for more than ninety (90) days preceding the filing of the petition herein. The marriage of the parties is irretrievably broken. Court finds Erach Matthew Lee Bennett is not the child of Scott Adam Benedix for purposes of this action. The minor and unemancipated children of the parties for which an order of custody is needed are identified in the Parenting Plan admitted into evidence as Exhibit C (hereinafter referred to as the Parenting Plan). Neither Petitioner nor Respondent has participated in any other custody proceeding regarding custody of the minor and unemancipated children in this or any other state; neither Petitioner nor Respondent has any information concerning any custody proceeding regarding the minor and unemancipated children pending in any court of this or any other state; and, neither Petitioner nor Respondent knows of any person not a party to this action who has actual physical custody of, or claims to have custody or visitation rights with, the minor and unemancipated children. After considering all relevant factors including those set forth in §452.375 RSMo., custody, visitation and parenting time provisions in the Parenting Plan are in the best interest of the children, with the following changes; Paragraph 1.C. Both parties shall work together to determine what elementary and secondary schools the children will attend; Paragraph II. C Summer Custody: Each party shall be entitled to one two week period between June 15 and August 17. After considering all relevant factors including those set forth in §452.340 RSMo.:The support provisions contained in the Parenting Plan are reasonable.The presumed amount of child support of $410.00 per month as shown in Form 14 received into evidence is correct. A health benefit plan for the minor and unemancipated children is available to the Father. The best interests of the minor and unemancipated children require that Father provide coverage under a health benefit plan. The marital property is identified and valued in Schedule A and Schedule B. After considering all relevant factors including those set forth in §452.330 RSMo. the court has divided the marital property and marital debts as set forth in Schedule A and Schedule B. All marital property and all marital debts have been identified and divided by the court. Petitioner has not requested maintenance. Respondent has not requested maintenance. Neither party has requested an award of attorney fees. Each party should pay their own attorney fees. Therefore, it is ordered that: The marriage of the parties be dissolved. Custody, visitation and parenting time of the children is ordered in accordance with the provisions of the Parenting Plan with the exceptions noted above. The parties and the children are ordered to comply with all provisions of the Parenting Plan. The Parenting Plan is ordered incorporated into and made a part of the Judgment. Judgment is entered in favor of Petitioner and against Respondent for child support in the amount of $410.00 per month beginning on April 1, 2016 and a like amount each month thereafter until otherwise modified or terminated by order of the court. Child support is payable to the Family Support Payment Center, PO Box 109002, Jefferson City, MO 65110-9002. Father is ordered to maintain a health benefit plan for the minor and unemancipated children. Mother shall pay 50%, and Father shall pay 50%, of all reasonable and necessary medical, hospitalization, prescription drug, optical, dental, and ort |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Tried by Court-Civil | |
March 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Disposition Hearing Held Scheduled For: 03/21/2016; 9:00 AM ; JAMES ANDREW HACKETT; Hickory |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Parent Education Complete Respondent's Certificate of Completion of the KIDS FIRST program filed/vf Filed By: HAROLD FLOYD GLASS II |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavits of Paternity filed Filed By: HAROLD FLOYD GLASS II |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.