Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Excelsior Gardens Property Investors Llc, filed a(n) Ac Rent And Possession case represented by Carter , Douglas A, against Vaughan , Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Christian County, MO, . Christian County, MO Superior Courts MO-Christian with LUNA, LARRY G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2018 |
CategoryAc Rent And Possession |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChristian County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Christian |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: June 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Req for Transcript Judgment | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Req for Transcript Judgment Request to Transcribe Judgment. Filed By: DOUGLAS A CARTER \n On Behalf Of: EXCELSIOR GARDENS PROPERTY INVESTORS LLC |
|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Execution/Garnishment Issued | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 18-GARN-547 for SAMUEL VAUGHAN; returnable date: 27-JUL-2018 |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Execution/Garnish | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Execution/Garnish Execution in Landlords Action. Filed By: DOUGLAS A CARTER \n On Behalf Of: EXCELSIOR GARDENS PROPERTY INVESTORS LLC |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered SEE FORMAL JUDGMENT FOR FUTHER DETAILS |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Consent Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.