Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Martin , Jeffrey Earl, filed a(n) case against Missouri Director Of Revenue, in the jurisdiction of Carroll County, MO, . Carroll County, MO Superior Courts with WALDEN, KEVIN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWALDEN, KEVIN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCarroll County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties Filed By: JOSEPH DONALD MCGAUGH \n Associated Entries: 10/17/2013 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Plaintiff appears by counsel Joseph McGaugh; Respondent appears not; at request of both parties in writing, cause continued to 11/21/13 at 9:00 am. \n Associated Entries: 10/17/2013 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 11/21/2013; 9:00 AM ; KEVIN L WALDEN; Carroll Circuit Division |
|
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Petitioner s Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JOSEPH DONALD MCGAUGH \n On Behalf Of: JEFFREY EARL MARTIN |
|
October 17, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 11/21/2013 - Dismissed by Parties \n Scheduled For: 11/21/2013; 9:00 AM ; KEVIN L WALDEN; Carroll Circuit Division |
|
October 17, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Plaintiff appears by counsel Joseph McGaugh; Respondent appears not; at request of both parties in writing, cause continued to 11/21/13 at 9:00 am. Hearing Continued From: 10/17/2013; 9:00 AM Hearing |
|
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Joint Application for Continuance; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JOSEPH DONALD MCGAUGH \n On Behalf Of: JEFFREY EARL MARTIN |
|
September 04, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 09/05/2013; 9:00 AM Hearing |
|
September 04, 2013 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Sent | |
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Respondent phones court. Parties have agreed to continue this matter out at least 30 days. Associated Entries: 09/04/2013 - Motion Granted/Sustained Cause continued to October 17, 2013 at 9:00 am. |
|
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted/Sustained Cause continued to October 17, 2013 at 9:00 am. Associated Entries: 09/04/2013 - Motion for Continuance Respondent phones court. Parties have agreed to continue this matter out at least 30 days. |
|
September 04, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 10/17/2013 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Plaintiff appears by counsel Joseph McGaugh; Respondent appears not; at request of both parties in writing, cause continued to 11/21/13 at 9:00 am. \n Scheduled For: 10/17/2013; 9:00 AM ; KEVIN L WALDEN; Carroll Circuit Division |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.