Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mcneile , James Michael, against Brune , Heather L, in the jurisdiction of Cape Girardeau County, MO, . Cape Girardeau County, MO Superior Courts MO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) with KOESTER, JULIA MEINERS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2020 |
CategoryAc Contract-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCape Girardeau County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Now on this day, cause called. Plaintiff appears by attorney of local counsel, Caroline Austin, and requests the case be continued rather than dismissed. Over the objection of the attorney, cause DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SO ORDERED: /s/ Judge Julia Meiners Koester, Div. IV Associated Entries: 06/25/2020 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Now on this day, Plaintiff appears by local attorney, Caroline Austin, and the Defendant appears not. Cause continued for service. Continuance date and time announced in open court. \n Associated Entries: 06/26/2020 - Dismissal Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 08/20/2020; 9:25 AM ; JULIA MEINERS KOESTER; Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge Assigned Cause assigned to Julia M. Koester following her appointment as Associate Circuit Judge to fill the vacancy left by the appointment of Judge Scott Lipke as Circuit Judge. |
|
June 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Dismissal Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 08/21/2020 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Now on this day, cause called. Plaintiff appears by attorney of local counsel, Caroline Austin, and requests the case be continued rather than dismissed. Over the objection of the attorney, cause DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SO ORDERED: /s/ Judge Julia Meiners Koester, Div. IV \n Scheduled For: 08/20/2020; 9:25 AM ; JULIA MEINERS KOESTER; Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
|
June 25, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Now on this day, Plaintiff appears by local attorney, Caroline Austin, and the Defendant appears not. Cause continued for service. Continuance date and time announced in open court. Hearing Continued From: 06/25/2020; 9:25 AM Dismissal Hearing |
|
April 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Dismissal Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 06/25/2020 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Now on this day, Plaintiff appears by local attorney, Caroline Austin, and the Defendant appears not. Cause continued for service. Continuance date and time announced in open court. \n Scheduled For: 06/25/2020; 9:25 AM ; SCOTT ALAN LIPKE; Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
|
April 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 05/28/2020; 9:30 AM ; SCOTT ALAN LIPKE; Cape Girardeau (Cape Girard) |
|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Service Return. Filed By: JAMES MICHAEL MCNEILE \n On Behalf Of: DISCOVER BANK |
|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Non-Est Document ID - 20-ADSM-699; Served To - BRUNE, HEATHER L; Server - ; Served Date - 27-APR-20; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Other; Reason Description - Non-est; Service Text - NEVER SENT OUT FOR SERVICE DUE TO COVID-19 |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Setting Scheduled Associated Entries: 04/27/2020 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled \n Scheduled For: 05/28/2020; 9:30 AM ; SCOTT ALAN LIPKE; Cape Girardeau (Cape Girard) |
|
April 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled The Supreme Court of Missouri's Order originally dated March 16, 2020 has again been extended. The above case has been rescheduled. Notice of new court date has been sent to the Defendant(s). Hearing Continued From: 05/07/2020; 9:30 AM Civil Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.