Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Credit Bureau Services, L.L.C. As Assignee Of Cape Radiology, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Shoener , Jonathan, against Boyd , Sharonda, in the jurisdiction of Cape Girardeau County, MO, . Cape Girardeau County, MO Superior Courts MO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) with LIPKE, SCOTT ALAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2018 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCape Girardeau County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: September 20, 2018Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: September 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed GARNISHMENT 21-GARN-382 NOT EMPLOYED TERMINATED 2/15/2022 |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Filed By: JONATHAN SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES, L.L.C. AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPE RADIOLOGY \n Associated Entries: 09/20/2018 - Judgment Entered 01/21/2022 - SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by Jonathan Shoener, attorney for the Plaintiff. $987.60. After applying all payments, creditsm and offsets, there remains unpaid court costs in the amount of $180.00, plus all future costs expended in this matter. Plus interest at the rate of 9.00% per annum from the date of Judgment until the Judgment is paid. SO ORDERED: /s/ Judge Scott A. Lipke, Assoc. Div. IV. (PLEASE CONSULT THE PLAINTIFF OR THE ATTORNEY FOR THE PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS, including the Court Costs, which are also to be paid to either the Plaintiff or Attorney for the Plaintiff.) \n Associated Entries: 09/28/2018 - Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court 01/21/2022 - SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by Jonathan Shoener, attorney for the Plaintiff. |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Garn Release/Return/Recall | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Full Release of Garnishment | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Garn Release/Return/Recall Release on Garnishment/Execution Number 21-GARN-382 |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Full Release of Garnishment RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT. Filed By: JONATHAN SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES, L.L.C. AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPE RADIOLOGY |
|
January 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Stmnt Judmt Balance Filed | |
January 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stmnt Judmt Balance Filed Statement of Judgment Balance.Total Unsatisfied Judgment Balance remaining due reflected on the Statement of Judgment Balance is: $65.38 Filed By: JONATHAN SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES, L.L.C. AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPE RADIOLOGY \n Associated Entries: 04/22/2021 - Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 21-GARN-382 for SHARONDA BOYD; returnable date: CONTINUOUS; Garnishee: FOUNTAINBLEAU LODGE. Make Checks Payable To: Michael L. Foster. Mail Funds To: Faber and Brand, LLC, P.O. Box 10110, Columbia, MO 65205. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.