Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank N.A., filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Armstrong , Jeanine R, against Craig , Kurt Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Cape Girardeau County, MO, . Cape Girardeau County, MO Superior Courts MO-Cape Girardeau (Cape Girard) with LIPKE, SCOTT ALAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2016 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCape Girardeau County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Cape Girardeau (Cape Girard) |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: August 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Filed By: JEANINE R ARMSTRONG \n Associated Entries: 08/04/2016 - Judgment Entered $1,746.68 + court costs of $50.00 and service fees (PLEASE CONSULT THE PLAINTIFF OR THE ATTORNEY FOR THE PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS, including the Court Costs, which are also to be paid to either the Plaintiff or Attorney for the Plaintiff.) Assoc. Div. IV. SEPTEMBER 21, 2016 - SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by Jeanine R. Armstrong, Attorney for the Plaintiff. |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered $1,746.68 + court costs of $50.00 and service fees (PLEASE CONSULT THE PLAINTIFF OR THE ATTORNEY FOR THE PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS, including the Court Costs, which are also to be paid to either the Plaintiff or Attorney for the Plaintiff.) Assoc. Div. IV. SEPTEMBER 21, 2016 - SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by Jeanine R. Armstrong, Attorney for the Plaintiff. Associated Entries: 09/21/2016 - Satisfaction of Judgment Filed SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Now on this day, Plaintiff appears by attorney of local counsel, Bill Hopkins, and the Defendant appears not and remains in Default. Petition taken up and JUDGMENT entered for the Plaintiff and against the Defendant as per JUDGMENT entered. SO ORDERED: /s/ Judge Scott A. Lipke Associated Entries: 06/10/2016 - Civil Setting Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 08/04/2016; 9:30 AM ; SCOTT ALAN LIPKE; Cape Girardeau (Cape Girard) |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 16-ADSM-1064; Served To - CRAIG, KURT THOMAS; Server - BULLOCK, JARRED; Served Date - 27-JUN-16; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Special Process Server; Reason Description - Served |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service SERVICE NOTICE. Filed By: JEANINE R ARMSTRONG \n On Behalf Of: CAPITAL ONE BANK N.A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.