Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jarvis , Dora Marleen, filed a(n) case against Jarvis , Gerald Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Cape Girardeau County, MO, . Cape Girardeau County, MO Superior Courts with BULLERDIECK, MICHAEL J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCape Girardeau County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Dissolution | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Uncontested | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Dissolution JUDGMENT DISSOLVING MARRIAGE granted. No children. No Maintenance. Property and debt division as per order. Petitioner's name is changed from Dora Marleen Jarvis to Dora Marleen Grayson. Costs assessed against Petitioner. SO ORDERED: /s/Michael J. Bullerdieck, Judge Certified copy mailed to both attorneys. Filed By: MICHAEL J BULLERDIECK |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Sound Recording Log Sheet | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Held Petitioner appears in person and by Counsel, Frank Siebert. Respondent appears in person and by Counsel, John Schneider. Attorneys announce parties have reached an agreement. Testimony presented. Cause taken under advisement pending formal order. Scheduled For: 01/27/2014; 10:00 AM ; MICHAEL J BULLERDIECK; Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed Answer to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JOHN R SCHNEIDER \n On Behalf Of: GERALD WAYNE JARVIS |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Conference Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/27/2014 - Pre-Trial Conference Held Petitioner appears in person and by Counsel, Frank Siebert. Respondent appears in person and by Counsel, John Schneider. Attorneys announce parties have reached an agreement. Testimony presented. Cause taken under advisement pending formal order. \n Scheduled For: 01/27/2014; 10:00 AM ; MICHAEL J BULLERDIECK; Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Review Held Attorneys Rebecca Reed and Matt Ferrell appear. Cause set for pre-trial, January 27 and for bench trial, March 10, 2014. Scheduled For: 11/25/2013; 9:31 AM ; MICHAEL J BULLERDIECK; Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Filed By: MICHAEL J BULLERDIECK |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Entry of Appearance; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JOHN R SCHNEIDER \n On Behalf Of: GERALD WAYNE JARVIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.