Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
City Of Cape Girardeau, Missouri, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Holliday , Reagan, against Stratton , Danny Gene, in the jurisdiction of Cape Girardeau County, MO, . Cape Girardeau County, MO Superior Courts MO-Cape Girardeau (Cape Girard) with LEWIS, BENJAMIN FREDERICK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2007 |
CategoryCc Tax Action Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationCape Girardeau County, MO |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Filing Court HouseMO-Cape Girardeau (Cape Girard) |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed on this date. All costs shall be taxed against the deft Filed By: REAGAN HOLLIDAY |
|
December 17, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 01/08/2008; 9:00 AM ; BENJAMIN FREDERICK LEWIS; Cape Girardeau (Cape Girard) |
|
December 14, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Cause continued by the city atty for dismissal to be filed Hearing Continued From: 12/17/2007; 9:00 AM Case Review |
|
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled At the Common Pleas Courthouse in Cape Girardeau, Missouri Associated Entries: 12/17/2007 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled \n Scheduled For: 01/08/2008; 9:00 AM ; BENJAMIN FREDERICK LEWIS; Cape Girardeau (Cape Girard) |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled At the Common Pleas Courthouse in Cape Girardeau, Missouri Associated Entries: 12/14/2007 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Cause continued by the city atty for dismissal to be filed \n Scheduled For: 12/17/2007; 9:00 AM ; BENJAMIN FREDERICK LEWIS; Cape Girardeau (Cape Girard) |
|
November 19, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Pltf appears by atty Regan Holliday; Deft appears in person, pro se. Cause continued for possible settlement Hearing Continued From: 11/19/2007; 9:00 AM Case Review |
|
August 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed Filed By: DANNY GENE STRATTON |
|
August 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 07-SMCC-778; Served To - STRATTON, DANNY GENE; Server - WITHERS BROADCASTING; Served Date - 01-AUG-07; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Special Process Server; Reason Description - Served |
|
July 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order - Special Process Server Signed by Clerk. |
|
July 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Circuit Document ID: 07-SMCC-778, for STRATTON, DANNY GENE; Issued and directed to Process Server for service. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.