Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Director Of Revenue, filed a(n) case against New , Stanley Bert, in the jurisdiction of Boone County, MO, . Boone County, MO Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateApril 18, 2014 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
Filing LocationBoone County, MO |
Judgment Entered
Date: April 18, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sub Counsel by Auto Script Michael Kisling enters his appearance as attorney of record for the Missouri Department of Revenue and substitutes his appearance for Desiree Vitale pursuant to correspondence dated December 20, 2017 to the Office of State Courts Administrator requesting the substitution. |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed FULL SATISFACTION - INDIVIDUAL INCOME. Filed By: DESIREE JUDE VITALE |
|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail-Undeliverable GARN REFUND RETURNED BY POST OFFICE WITH FORWARDING ADDRESS. (kf) Filed By: STANLEY BERT NEW |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Release Filed Release on Garnishment/Execution Number 14-GARN-4564 ANY WITHHELD FUNDS TO BE RETURNED TO DEBTOR. NOTICE TO GARNISHEE. (kf) |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request Filed Garnishment Release; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: MERILEE ANN CROCKETT |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 14-GARN-4564; Served To - PREMIER PAPER AND PACKAGING, INC; Server - SO SHERIFF OF BOONE COUNTY - COLUMBIA; Served Date - 19-NOV-14; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 14-GARN-4564 for STANLEY BERT NEW; TO BCSD FOR SERVICE ON PREMIER PAPER AND PACKAGING, INC. (kf); returnable date: 13-APR-2015; Garnishee: PREMIER PAPER AND PACKAGING, INC |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Execution/Garnish Garnishment Application and Interrogatories; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: MERILEE ANN CROCKETT |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered CERTIFICATE OF TAX LIEN - INDIVIDUAL INCOME TAX. SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED 5-15-2015 On Behalf Of: DIRECTOR OF REVENUE |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event | DOR Tax Lien Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.