Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts MO-Atchison with HERRON, COREY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERRON, COREY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2013 |
CategoryCc Dissolution- W/O Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseMO-Atchison |
Case Outcome TypeUncontested |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Dissolution Judgement filed. Certified copy mailed to Petitioner, Respondent and Attorney Hurst. Filed By: COREY KEITH HERRON |
|
April 07, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing Held Case called. Petitioner appears in person and with Attorney Hurst. Respondent appears in person, pro se. The Court finds no reasonable likelihood that this marriage can be preserved and finds the marriage is irretrievably broken and is ordered dissolved. No children born of the marriage. The name of the Petitioner is hereby ordered changed to her former name of Madron. Costs taxed to the Petitioner and are paid. Dissolution Docket Entry form filed. Scheduled For: 04/07/2014; 9:00 AM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Uncontested | |
March 27, 2014 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Sent | |
March 19, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 04/07/2014 - Hearing Held Case called. Petitioner appears in person and with Attorney Hurst. Respondent appears in person, pro se. The Court finds no reasonable likelihood that this marriage can be preserved and finds the marriage is irretrievably broken and is ordered dissolved. No children born of the marriage. The name of the Petitioner is hereby ordered changed to her former name of Madron. Costs taxed to the Petitioner and are paid. Dissolution Docket Entry form filed. \n Scheduled For: 04/07/2014; 9:00 AM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Held Case called. Attorney Bothwell appears for Attorney Hurst for the Petitioner. Case set for default hearing on April 7, 2014 at 9:00 A.M. CKH Scheduled For: 03/18/2014; 9:00 AM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Scheduled Associated Entries: 03/18/2014 - Trial Setting Held Case called. Attorney Bothwell appears for Attorney Hurst for the Petitioner. Case set for default hearing on April 7, 2014 at 9:00 A.M. CKH \n Scheduled For: 03/18/2014; 9:00 AM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note On its own motion, the court sets matter for case management/trial setting on March 18, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys may submit trial dates in lieu of appearance. CKH Filed By: COREY KEITH HERRON |
|
March 07, 2014 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Sent | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 13-SMCC-276; Served To - KIRKPATRICK, WILLIAM GENE; Server - PAGE COUNTY SHERIFF - IOWA; Served Date - 07-NOV-13; Served Time - 13:30:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served Attorney Hurst notified of service. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.