Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Blue Sky Satellite Services, Inc, Truck Insurance Exchange, filed a(n) Cc Pers Injury-Other case represented by Reidy , Patrick Mark, against Fairbanks , Becky M, Fairbanks , Kevin L, represented by Nichols , Jeffrey Scott, in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts MO-Atchison with PROKES, ROGER M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePROKES, ROGER M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2013 |
CategoryCc Pers Injury-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Atchison |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice filed approved by both attorneys of record and signed by Judge Prokes. Copy of same scanned and emailed to both attorneys of record. |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Parties | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by both attorneys of record. |
|
December 11, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 03/03/2015; 1:00 PM ; ROGER M PROKES; Atchison |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Costs &/or Fines Paid in Full | |
December 11, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 04/20/2015; 9:00 AM ; ROGER M PROKES; Atchison |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal E-MAIL DOCKET ENTRY - Judgment of Dismissal: Based on Stipulation to Dismiss filed in this case, the same is ordered dismissed with prejudice. The same is also to be removed from the April 20,2015 jury trial docket. RMP Filed By: ROGER M PROKES |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Filed By: JEFFREY SCOTT NICHOLS |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice to Take Deposition Third Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Corporate Represenative of Truck Insurance Exchange with Request for Production Pursuant to Rule 57.03(b)(4) and Rule 57.03(b)(3) filed. Third Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Corporate Represenative of Blue Sky Satellite Services with Request for Production Pursuant to Rule 57.03(b)(4) and Rule 57.03(b)(3) filed. Filed By: JEFFREY SCOTT NICHOLS |
|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice to Take Deposition Second Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Corporate Represenative of Truck Insurance Exchange with Request for Production Pursuant to Rule 57.03(b)(4) and Rule 57.03(b)(3) filed. Second Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Corporate Represenative of Blue Sky Satellite Services with Request for Production Pursuant to Rule 57.03(b)(4) and Rule 57.03(b)(3) filed. Filed By: JEFFREY SCOTT NICHOLS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.