Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nebraska Furniture Mart, filed a(n) case represented by Rowatt , John Brock, against Umbarger , Julie M, Umbarger , Mike A, in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts with HERRON, COREY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERRON, COREY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Judgment Entered
Date: January 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note With check received today, balance of Garnishment 14-GARN-264 shows a balance of zero. |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Release Filed Return on Garnishment/Execution Number 14-GARN-264 - Past return date. |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 14-GARN-264; Served To - ATCHISON COUNTY HIGHWAY DEPARTMENT; Server - SO ATCHISON COUNTY-ROCK PORT; Served Date - 17-MAR-14; Served Time - 15:16:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 14-GARN-264 for MIKE A UMBARGER; Attn: Payroll Dept.; returnable date: 11-JUN-2014; Garnishee: ATCHISON COUNTY HIGHWAY DEPARTMENT - Garnishment Order with Interrogatories issued to Atchison County Sheriff for service with firm check for $58.43 for service fee. |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Judgment Entry filed and entered for the Plaintiff and against the Defendants as follows: Principal - $788.59; Interest - $105.78; Attorney Fees - $118.28; for a Total of $1,012.65 and costs plus interest at 18% per annum on the pricipal amount only from and after this date of Judgment. Filed By: COREY KEITH HERRON |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Payment received on balance due on service fee. |
|
January 23, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing Held Case called. Plaintiff appears by local counsel Hurst. No appearance by the Defendants. Judgment held pending payment of balance owed for service. Balance due of service fee of $31.47. CKH Civil Docket Sheet filed. Scheduled For: 01/23/2014; 9:00 AM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice mailed to Attorney Rowatt. | |
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Family Member/Roommate Served Document ID - 13-ADSM-794; Served To - UMBARGER, MIKE A; Server - SO ATCHISON COUNTY-ROCK PORT; Served Date - 16-DEC-13; Served Time - 14:30:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - By leaving a copy with Julie Umbarger. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.