Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Horowitz , Donald A, against Price , Sherry, in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts MO-Atchison with HERRON, COREY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERRON, COREY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2013 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Atchison |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: July 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 16-GARN-325; Served To - TRAILS END-ROCK PORT; Server - SO ATCHISON COUNTY-ROCK PORT; Served Date - 27-JUN-16; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 16-GARN-325 for SHERRY PRICE; GARNISH WAGES; returnable date: 15-NOV-2016; Garnishee: TRAILS END-ROCK PORT - GARNISHMENT PREPARED FOR SERVICE AND IS ATTACHED. |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Execution/Garnish Request for GARNISHMENT filed; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. On Behalf Of: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC |
|
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Req for Transcript Judgment Request for Transcript Judgment received and same is entered in order to place a lien on property. Filed By: DONALD A HOROWITZ |
|
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court $1,946.23 in damages; $85.90 in pre-judgment interest; for a Total of $2,032.13 plus court costs. |
|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Civil Judgment filed and entered for the Plaintiff and against the Defendant as follows: $1,946.23 in damages; $85.90 in pre-judgment interest; for a Total of $2,032.13 plus court costs with post judgment interest to be earned at the rate of 9% per annum as called for by contract or statute. Filed stamped copy of Judgment mailed to Attorney Smith, Attorney Horowitz and one mailed to the Defendant. Filed By: COREY KEITH HERRON |
|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Case called. Plaintiff appears by local counsel Smith. Defendant fails to appear even though duly summoned and called and Judgment by default is granted as requested in the petition filed. CKH Associated Entries: 06/05/2013 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 06/05/2013 - Civil Setting Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 07/11/2013; 1:30 PM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 13-ADSM-310; Served To - PRICE, SHERRY; Server - SO ATCHISON COUNTY-ROCK PORT; Served Date - 07-JUN-13; Served Time - 16:40:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted/Sustained Case continued to July 11, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. If no alias requested by said date, case may be dismissed. CKH Filed By: COREY KEITH HERRON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.