Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding - Ca, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Early , Elizabeth Josephine, against Mires , Katerina, in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts MO-Atchison with HERRON, COREY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERRON, COREY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2013 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Atchison |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: June 06, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request Filed Request for a Transcript Judgment received and same is entered in order to place a lien on property. |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court Principal - $124.23; Interest - $268.79 for a total of $393.02 plus costs of court. This Judgment shall bear interest at the rate of 09.00% per annum. |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Judgment Entry filed and entered for the Plaintiff and against the Defendant as follows: Principal - $124.23; Interest - $268.79 for a total of $393.02 plus costs of court. This Judgment shall bear interest at the rate of 09.00% per annum on count I. Court II is dismissed withou prejudice. Filed stamped copy mailed to Attorney Smith, Attorney Early and one to the Defendant. Filed By: COREY KEITH HERRON |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Case called. Plaintiff appears by Attorney Smith. Defendant fails to appear though duly summoned and called and Judgment by default is granted as requested in the petition filed herein. CKH Associated Entries: 05/23/2013 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 05/28/2013 - Civil Setting Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 06/06/2013; 9:00 AM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Setting Scheduled Associated Entries: 06/06/2013 - Default Judgment Case called. Plaintiff appears by Attorney Smith. Defendant fails to appear though duly summoned and called and Judgment by default is granted as requested in the petition filed herein. CKH \n Scheduled For: 06/06/2013; 9:00 AM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
May 28, 2013 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Sent | |
May 23, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 05/23/2013; 9:00 AM Civil Setting |
|
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 13-ADSM-240; Served To - MIRES, KATERINA; Server - SO ATCHISON COUNTY-ROCK PORT; Served Date - 01-APR-13; Served Time - 18:49:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 13-ADSM-240, for MIRES, KATERINA. - Summons issued to Atchison County Sheriff for service. Copy of summons mailed to Attorney Early to notify her of time and date of hearing. |
|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Setting Scheduled Hearing set for 05/23/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Associated Entries: 05/23/2013 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 05/23/2013; 9:00 AM ; ROGER M PROKES; Atchison |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.