Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Neemann , Linda K, filed a(n) case against Neemann , Marvin E, in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts with HERRON, COREY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERRON, COREY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Dissolution Judgment Decreeing Dissolution of Marriage filed. Marriage is ordered dissolved. No child support ordered. See file for property disbursement. Costs taxed to the petitioner and are paid. Certified copy of Judgment with attached Parenting Plan mailed to the Petitoner, Respondent and to Attorney Bothwell. Filed By: COREY KEITH HERRON |
|
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Uncontested | |
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Costs &/or Fines Paid in Full | |
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Form 14 Filed | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Uncont Dissolution Hrng Held Case called. Petitioner appears in person and with Attorney Bothwell. Respondent appears not and is in default. Evidence is heard and the Court finds no reasonable likelihood that this marriage can be preserved and finds the marriage is irretrievably borken and is dissolved. Joint legal and physical custody of the minor child awarded to both parties with address of petitioner being the address of the child for school and mailing purposes. No child support ordered. See file for more information. Costs taxed to petitioner and are paid. Dissolution Docket Entry and Judgment form filed. Log notes of proceedings filed. Scheduled For: 09/20/2012; 2:00 PM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
September 11, 2012 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing Filed Filed By: SHARLEEN PRITT-BOTHWELL |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Uncont Dissolution Hrng Sched Associated Entries: 09/20/2012 - Uncont Dissolution Hrng Held Case called. Petitioner appears in person and with Attorney Bothwell. Respondent appears not and is in default. Evidence is heard and the Court finds no reasonable likelihood that this marriage can be preserved and finds the marriage is irretrievably borken and is dissolved. Joint legal and physical custody of the minor child awarded to both parties with address of petitioner being the address of the child for school and mailing purposes. No child support ordered. See file for more information. Costs taxed to petitioner and are paid. Dissolution Docket Entry and Judgment form filed. Log notes of proceedings filed. \n Scheduled For: 09/20/2012; 2:00 PM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed - Domestic Rel Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed. Filed By: SHARLEEN PRITT-BOTHWELL |
|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Voluntary Appearance by Respondent filed. Filed By: MARVIN E NEEMANN |
|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.