Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midwestern Health Management Inc, filed a(n) case represented by Schmitt , David R, against Robertson , Angela Lynn, Robertson , Kevin S, represented by Briles , Noah J., in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts with HERRON, COREY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERRON, COREY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Judgment Entered
Date: January 17, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notc/Sugg of Bankruptcy Filed Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed. Filed By: NOAH J. BRILES |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filing: Garnishment returned from the Cole County sheriff unserved stating "release per attorney". |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed Response to Interrogatories Garnishment/Execution Number 14-GARN-676 |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Release Filed Release on Garnishment/Execution Number 14-GARN-676 - Letter received and filed on Garnishment to be released issued for service to Cole County Sheriff on 08/05/2014. |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 14-GARN-676 for ANGELA LYNN ROBERTSON; Garnish earnings.; returnable date: 03-NOV-2014; Garnishee: WRDCC - Garnishment Order with Interrogatories issued to Cole County Sheriff for service with firm check for $30.00 for service fee. |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Partial Satisfaction of Judmt Partial Satisfaction of Judgment filed showing satisfaction against the defendant, Kevin Robertson. Filed By: DAVID R SCHMITT |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Release Filed Return on Garnishment/Execution Number 13-GARN-1104 - Past return date. |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed Garnishment/Execution Number 13-GARN-1104 |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 13-GARN-1104; Served To - NOYES HOME; Server - SO BUCHANAN CO-ST JOSEPH; Served Date - 12-NOV-13; Served Time - 10:14:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 13-GARN-1104 for ANGELA LYNN ROBERTSON; Garnish earnings.; returnable date: 03-FEB-2014; Garnishee: NOYES HOME - Garnishment Order with Interrogatories issued to Buchanan County Sheriff for service with firm check for $40.00 for service fee. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.