Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midwestern Health Management, Inc., filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Schmitt , David R, against Cherry , Nancy E, Cherry , Timothy A, in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts MO-Atchison with HERRON, COREY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERRON, COREY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2012 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Atchison |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: July 26, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed Filed stamped copy returned to Attorney Schmitt and one to the Defendants. |
|
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Judgment Entry filed and entered for the Plaintiff and against the Defendant as follows: Principal on Count I - $667.98; Principal on Count II - $578.26 and interest - $56.16, plus costs of court and interest on the Judgment at 9% per annum. Stay of Execution granted. See file for more information. Filed stamped copy of Judgment mailed to Attorney Smith, and Attorney Schmitt (with notice of balance due for service) and one mailed to the defendants Timothy and Nancy E. Cherry. Filed By: COREY KEITH HERRON |
|
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Case called. Plaintiff appears by local counsel Smith, Defendant fails to appears although duly summoned and Judgment by default is granted as requested in the petition filed herein. CKH Associated Entries: 06/21/2012 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Case called. Plaintiff appears by Attorney Smith. Defendant, Timothy Cherry appears in person. Case continued to July 26, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. CKH Civil Dispositon docket sheet filed. \n Associated Entries: 06/21/2012 - Civil Setting Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 07/26/2012; 9:00 AM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
June 21, 2012 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Sent | |
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Civil Setting Scheduled Associated Entries: 07/26/2012 - Default Judgment Case called. Plaintiff appears by local counsel Smith, Defendant fails to appears although duly summoned and Judgment by default is granted as requested in the petition filed herein. CKH \n Scheduled For: 07/26/2012; 9:00 AM ; COREY KEITH HERRON; Atchison |
|
June 21, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Case called. Plaintiff appears by Attorney Smith. Defendant, Timothy Cherry appears in person. Case continued to July 26, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. CKH Civil Dispositon docket sheet filed. Hearing Continued From: 06/21/2012; 9:00 AM Civil Setting |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 12-ADSM-280; Served To - CHERRY, TIMOTHY A; Server - SO ATCHISON COUNTY-ROCK PORT; Served Date - 15-JUN-12; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - No time or who was personally served docketed on summons. |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 12-ADSM-279; Served To - CHERRY, NANCY E; Server - SO ATCHISON COUNTY-ROCK PORT; Served Date - 15-JUN-12; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - No time stated or who was served personally on either returned summons. |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 12-ADSM-279, for CHERRY, NANCY E. - Summons issued to Atchison County Sheriff for service. Copy of summons mailed to Attorney Schmitt to notify him of time and date of hearing. |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Pet Filed in Associate Ct Filed By: DAVID R SCHMITT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.