Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asanasavest, Nittaya, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Villanueva, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2001 |
CategorySmall Claims: (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedJune 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
September 17, 2002 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Full | |
February 22, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed | |
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event | SC Judgment: Uncontested | |
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.