Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mccullough, Harrison, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Wright County, MN, . Wright County, MN Superior Courts with Bollman, Suzanne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2021 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWright County, MN |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Notice of Judicial Determination Index #14
Date: August 16, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #3
Date: October 13, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #4
Date: October 18, 2021Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Bollman, Suzanne Index #6
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Filing of Order Index #7
Date: October 19, 2021Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Bollman, Suzanne Index #8
Date: October 19, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #9
Date: January 14, 2022Returned Mail Filed By: Plaintiff McCullough, Harrison Index #10
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #11
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #12
Date: June 28, 2022Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #13
Date: August 16, 2022Returned Mail Filed By: Plaintiff McCullough, Harrison Index #15
Date: August 24, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #16
Date: December 12, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #21
Date: May 05, 2023Notice of Deficiency Index #17
Date: March 07, 2023Notice of Deficiency Index #18
Date: April 07, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion Index #19
Date: May 04, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #20
Date: May 04, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #22
Date: June 13, 2023Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Bollman, Suzanne Index #23
Date: June 15, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #24
Date: June 15, 2023Copy Request Index #25
Date: June 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #25 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Bollman, Suzanne Index #23 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #24 | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #22 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #21 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion and Motion Index #19 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #20 | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Deficiency Index #18 | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Deficiency Index #17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.