Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Misamore, Jennifer Lee, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Paul Peter Sarratori, in the jurisdiction of Wright County, MN, . Wright County, MN Superior Courts with McPherson, Catherine presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWright County, MN |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: August 19, 2021Notice and Acknowledgement of Service
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: March 17, 2022Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: August 19, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: April 26, 2022Certificate of Representation
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 19, 2021Demand for Judicial Determination - Forfeit MV (MSA 169A.63)
Date: August 13, 2021Proposed Order or Document
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Seizure and Intent to Forfeit
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 02, 2022Order-Other
Date: July 27, 2022Exhibit List
Date: September 02, 2022Witness List
Date: September 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Index # 18
Judge: McPherson, Catherine |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissed
Judge: McPherson, Catherine |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 17
Judge: McPherson, Catherine |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Index # 15
Judge: McPherson, Catherine |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Index # 16
Judge: McPherson, Catherine |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 14
Judge: McPherson, Catherine |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order-Other
Judge: McPherson, Catherine |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.