Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Winona County Health And Human Services, filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent case against Nguyen, Matthew Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Buytendorp, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBuytendorp, Nancy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2022 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Index #46 | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Proceeding and Discharging Patient Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #44 | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #45 | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #43 | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Provisional Discharge Index #42 | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Respondent NGUYEN, MATTHEW RYAN Index #41 | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Respondent NGUYEN, MATTHEW RYAN Index #40 | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney ELLISON, PAUL RYAN; Attorney JONES, DAVID JOHN; Respondent NGUYEN, MATTHEW RYAN Index #39 | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Schedule Hearing | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of Status Report Index #38 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.