Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Stanislaus Co Public Guardian, filed a(n) Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Probate.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 1995 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseProbate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 1999 | Hearing | Petition Hearing | |
September 03, 1999 | Hearing | Petition Hearing | |
August 06, 1999 | Hearing | Petition Hearing | |
April 09, 1999 | Hearing | Petition Hearing | |
March 26, 1998 | Hearing | Petition Hearing | |
September 26, 1997 | Hearing | Petition Hearing | |
August 26, 1997 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause | |
August 14, 1997 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause | |
June 24, 1997 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause | |
April 22, 1997 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.