Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Winona County Health And Human Services, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Adams, Addison, in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Buytendorp, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBuytendorp, Nancy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Index #45
Date: January 17, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #25
Date: December 15, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #41
Date: January 13, 2023Order Granting Guardianship Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #40
Date: January 13, 2023Amended Order Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #33
Date: January 03, 2023Amended Letters Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #35
Date: January 03, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #37
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Index #36
Date: January 05, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion Filed By: Attorney ELLISON, PAUL RYAN Index #26
Date: December 30, 2022Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #38
Date: January 13, 2023Petition for Emergency Guardianship - Conservatorship Index #1
Date: September 30, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #23
Date: December 14, 2022Notice of Hearing Index #2
Date: September 30, 2022Notice of Hearing Index #22
Date: December 14, 2022Petition for Guardianship Filed By: Petitioner Winona County Health and Human Services Index #16
Date: December 13, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #27
Date: December 30, 2022Notice of Hearing Index #18
Date: December 13, 2022Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #7
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney ELLISON, PAUL RYAN Index #3
Date: September 30, 2022Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #8
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Index #14
Date: October 05, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #6
Date: October 03, 2022Order Granting Emergency Guardianship Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #11
Date: October 05, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #30
Date: January 03, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #24
Date: December 14, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #28
Date: December 30, 2022Reminder Notice Filed By: Attorney ELLISON, PAUL RYAN Index #15
Date: December 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Review Filed By: Emergency Guardian Adams, Thomas; Guardian Adams, Thomas Index #46 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Index #45 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #41 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Guardianship Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #40 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters of Guardianship Filed By: Emergency Guardian Adams, Thomas; Guardian Adams, Thomas Index #43 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to New Guardians Filed By: Emergency Guardian Adams, Thomas; Guardian Adams, Thomas Index #44 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #37 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #38 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.