Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
County Of Winona, Kolter, Mark Walter, Iii, filed a(n) Support case against Kolter, Brandy Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Opat, Matthew presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2016 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
|
Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #26
Date: April 10, 2020Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #28
Date: April 10, 2020Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #27
Date: April 10, 2020Order to Show Cause Judicial Officer: Hayne, Lisa R Index #17
Date: February 25, 2019Notice of Filing of Order Index #22
Date: April 11, 2019Order for Child Support Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle Index #11
Date: January 12, 2017Notice of Case Filing Index #7
Date: December 13, 2016Judgment Index #21
Date: April 11, 2019Notice of Filing of Order Index #12
Date: January 19, 2017Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Opat, Matthew J. Index #23
Date: April 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #26 | |
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #28 | |
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #27 | |
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing | |
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index # 28 | |
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index # 27 | |
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index # 26 | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor Index #24 | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #25 | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor Index # 24 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.