Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
New Day Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Barham, Daniel Olen - Lead Attorney, against Jacobs, Karen, Jacobs, Terry S, in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Leahy, Mary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryReduced Mortgage Redemption |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Summons Index #3
Date: December 30, 2019Civil Cover Sheet Index #2
Date: December 30, 2019Notice of Case Filing Index #5
Date: January 10, 2020Complaint-Civil Index #8
Date: January 15, 2020Notice of Filing of Order Index #13
Date: February 28, 2020Notice of Case Filing Index #9
Date: February 03, 2020Certify Personal Service Index #11
Date: February 03, 2020Order Reducing Redemption Period Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C. Index #12
Date: February 28, 2020Certify Personal Service Index #10
Date: February 03, 2020Summons Index #4
Date: December 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #13 | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Reducing Redemption Period Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C. Index #12 | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Reducing Redemption Period Index # 12 (Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C. )
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 13 | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Mortgage Redemption Period Reduced | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing Index #9 | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index #11 | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index #10 | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Schedule Hearing | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing Index # 9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.