Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Court Trial filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Leahy, Mary C. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Index # 30
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 29
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 28
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal Index # 27 (Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C. )
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal With Prejudice - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C.)
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Order Index # 25 (Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C. )
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 24
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 23
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order-Other Index # 22 (Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C. )
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Order Index # 20
Judge: Leahy, Mary C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.