Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Southeast Mechanical Inc, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Novotny, Lee Michael - Lead Attorney, against Vafaei, Mac, represented by Grinde, Paul H - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Leahy, Mary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeahy, Mary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
|
Judgment Judicial Officer: Lallemont, Angela Index #16
Date: June 12, 2023Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Lallemont, Angela Index #18
Date: June 09, 2023Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #17
Date: June 12, 2023Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #19
Date: June 15, 2023Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Cajacob, John T. Index #13
Date: January 20, 2023Order Vacating Judgment Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #20
Date: July 14, 2023Correspondence Index #8
Date: December 23, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #7
Date: December 23, 2022Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #14
Date: January 20, 2023Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #12
Date: January 19, 2023Counterclaim Index #9
Date: December 23, 2022Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #10
Date: December 23, 2022Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Leahy, Mary C. Index #3
Date: September 22, 2022Summons Index #4
Date: September 22, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #6
Date: October 10, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #5
Date: September 22, 2022Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: September 21, 2022Correspondence Index #2
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Vacating Judgment Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #20 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #19 | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Judicial Officer: Lallemont, Angela Index #16 | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #17 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Lallemont, Angela Index #18 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney GRINDE, PAUL H; Attorney NOVOTNY, LEE MICHAEL Index #15 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Cajacob, John T. Index #13 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.