Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gundersen Clinic, Ltd, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Vanderheyden, David W. - Lead Attorney, against Witt, Crystal L, in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Buytendorp, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
|
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #5
Date: March 16, 2017Notice of Hearing Index #2
Date: December 14, 2016Statement of Claim and Summons Index #1
Date: December 13, 2016Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #4
Date: March 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #6 | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index # 6 | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #5 | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. Index #4 | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 5 | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 4 (Judicial Officer: Buytendorp, Nancy L. )
Judge: Buytendorp, Nancy L. |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant WITT, CRYSTAL L | |
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index #2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.