Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cerise, Dominic, Cerise, Jeffrey Scott, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Moe, Douglas John, Moe, Hunter Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Hayne, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2016 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
|
Notice of Hearing Index #4
Date: February 09, 2017Statement of Claim and Summons Filed By: Plaintiff CERISE, JEFFREY SCOTT Index #1
Date: December 12, 2016Notice of Hearing Index #2
Date: December 13, 2016Notice of Hearing Index #5
Date: March 24, 2017Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #6
Date: March 30, 2017Correspondence Filed By: Plaintiff CERISE, JEFFREY SCOTT Index #8
Date: March 31, 2017Affidavit of Service Index #9
Date: April 03, 2017Affidavit of Service Index #10
Date: April 03, 2017Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Lallemont, Angela Index #12
Date: August 07, 2017Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #13
Date: August 07, 2017Notice of Deficiency Index #14
Date: October 23, 2017Correspondence Index #16
Date: November 13, 2018Notice of Motion and Affidavit Index #15
Date: November 13, 2018Notice of Discrepancy Index #17
Date: November 15, 2018Order-Other Judicial Officer: Hayne, Lisa R Index #19
Date: December 03, 2018Correspondence Index #18
Date: November 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Plaintiff Cerise, Dominic; Plaintiff CERISE, JEFFREY SCOTT; Name Not Available Online; Defendant Moe, Douglas John; Defendant Moe, Hunter Douglas Index #20 | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 20 | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Hayne, Lisa R Index #19 | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order-Other Index # 19 (Judicial Officer: Hayne, Lisa R )
Judge: Hayne, Lisa R |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Settled (Judicial Officer: Hayne, Lisa R)
Judge: Hayne, Lisa R |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Hayne, Lisa R | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Hayne, Lisa R )
Judge: Hayne, Lisa R |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #18 | |
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 18 | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Discrepancy Index #17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.