Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Volkmann, Jeffrey, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Waseca County, MN, . Waseca County, MN Superior Courts with Hanks, Carol M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHanks, Carol M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2018 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWaseca County, MN |
|
Notice of Filing of Order Index #35
Date: January 15, 2019Renunciation of Right to Appointment or to Nominate Index #4
Date: February 26, 2018Will Index #1
Date: February 26, 2018Petition for Formal Probate of Will-Appt PR Rep-Unsupervised Index #2
Date: February 26, 2018Renunciation of Right to Appointment or to Nominate Index #3
Date: February 26, 2018Final Accounting Index #21
Date: November 30, 2018Petition for Ord of Comp Settle of Estate-Decree of Distrib Index #24
Date: November 30, 2018Receipts for Assets by Distributee Index #23
Date: November 30, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #25
Date: November 30, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Index #30
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Index #19
Date: April 05, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #15
Date: March 26, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #22
Date: November 30, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #14
Date: March 26, 2018Inventory and Appraisement Index #20
Date: November 30, 2018Order Allowing Final Account Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #27
Date: December 04, 2018Affidavit of Mailing Index #13
Date: March 26, 2018Letters Testamentary Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #18
Date: April 05, 2018Copy Request Index #11
Date: March 26, 2018Affidavit of Publication Index #12
Date: March 26, 2018Notice to Creditors Index #10
Date: February 28, 2018Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #6
Date: February 26, 2018Copy Request Index #9
Date: February 26, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #7
Date: February 26, 2018Renunciation of Right to Appointment or to Nominate Index #5
Date: February 26, 2018Order Discharging Personal Representative Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #34
Date: January 14, 2019Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative Index #31
Date: January 10, 2019Proposed Order or Document Index #32
Date: January 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #35 | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 35
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Discharging Personal Representative Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #34 | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Discharging Personal Representative Index # 34 (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Discharge Personal Representative (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M)
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative Index #31 | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #32 | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 32
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative Index # 31
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.