Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Osborne, Melissa Sue, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Trueblood-Konz, Raymond James - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Waseca County, MN, . Waseca County, MN Superior Courts with Hanks, Carol M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2023 |
CategoryMinor Settlement |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWaseca County, MN |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Notice of Deficiency Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #6
Date: August 31, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #8
Date: September 01, 2023Petition for Minor Settlement Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #1
Date: August 31, 2023Other Document Index #13
Date: December 12, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #4
Date: August 31, 2023Reminder Notice Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #12
Date: December 11, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #9
Date: October 11, 2023Order for Minor Settlement Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #11
Date: October 09, 2023Certificate of Representation Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #7
Date: August 31, 2023Cover Sheet for Non Public Documents Form 11.2 Index #2
Date: August 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Other Document Index #13 | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Reminder Notice Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #12 | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #9 | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Minor Settlement Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #11 | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #8 | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Deficiency Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #6 | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Minor Settlement Filed By: Attorney TRUEBLOOD-KONZ, RAYMOND JAMES Index #1 | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.