Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tate, Courtney Marie, filed a(n) Civil Other/Misc. case against Commissioner Of Public Safety, represented by Young, William James - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Waseca County, MN, . Waseca County, MN Superior Courts with Hanks, Carol M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHanks, Carol M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2018 |
CategoryCivil Other/Misc. |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWaseca County, MN |
|
Notice of Filing of Order Index #13
Date: July 16, 2018Affidavit-Other Index #7
Date: July 10, 2018Affidavit of Mailing Index #8
Date: July 10, 2018Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #4
Date: June 08, 2018Notice of Hearing Index #5
Date: June 08, 2018Answer Index #6
Date: July 10, 2018Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: June 08, 2018Certificate of Representation Index #3
Date: June 08, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #9
Date: July 12, 2018Order-Other Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #12
Date: July 16, 2018Affidavit of Mailing Index #10
Date: July 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #13 | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #12 | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 13
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order-Other Index # 12 (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Driver's license revocation upheld (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M)
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #9 | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #10 | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Index # 10
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 9
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.