Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts with Benson, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2023 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Other Document Filed By: Defendant Mikkelson, Candace R Index #11
Date: January 31, 2023Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #10
Date: January 31, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #13
Date: January 31, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #8
Date: January 25, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #9
Date: January 27, 2023Request for Writ of Recovery Index #7
Date: January 24, 2023Certify Personal Service Filed By: Defendant Mikkelson, Candace R Index #4
Date: January 18, 2023Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: January 10, 2023Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. Index #5
Date: January 24, 2023Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: January 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney HALLER, HOLLY ELIZABETH; Defendant Mikkelson, Candace R Index #15
Judge: Closed |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Filed By: Defendant Mikkelson, Candace R Index #14
Judge: Closed |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other Document Filed By: Defendant Mikkelson, Candace R Index #11
Judge: Closed |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #10
Judge: Closed |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index #13
Judge: Closed |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Proceeding In Forma Pauperis Filed By: Defendant Mikkelson, Candace R Index #12
Judge: Closed |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #9
Judge: Closed |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index #8
Judge: Closed |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Defendant Berg, Christopher J; Attorney HALLER, HOLLY ELIZABETH; Defendant Mikkelson, Candace R Index #6
Judge: Closed |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Recovery Index #7
Judge: Closed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.