Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Todd County, MN, . Todd County, MN Superior Courts with Benson, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2023 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTodd County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #12
Date: May 09, 2023Notice of Deficiency Filed By: Plaintiff Peterson, Curt D Index #11
Date: May 04, 2023Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: January 07, 2023Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: January 10, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: January 11, 2023Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. Index #4
Date: January 24, 2023Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #6
Date: May 02, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #7
Date: May 02, 2023Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #8
Date: May 03, 2023Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #9
Date: May 04, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #13
Date: May 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #13
Judge: Closed |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #12
Judge: Closed |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Plaintiff Peterson, Curt D; Defendant Peterson, Michael W Index #10
Judge: Closed |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deficiency Filed By: Plaintiff Peterson, Curt D Index #11
Judge: Closed |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #9
Judge: Closed |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Benson, Daniel A. Index #8
Judge: Closed |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #6
Judge: Closed |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index #7
Judge: Closed |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Closed |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. Index #4
Judge: Closed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.