Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lesure, Damarrio Dante Tramaine, filed a(n) Conciliation Appeal case represented by Scott A Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Steele County, MN, . Steele County, MN Superior Courts with Bueltel, Joseph A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2019 |
CategoryConciliation Appeal |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSteele County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 07, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 20, 2021Scheduling Order
Date: May 20, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: August 17, 2021Pandemic Notice of Cancelled or Rescheduled Hearing
Date: April 28, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 12, 2019Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: December 04, 2019Demand for Removal to District Court
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: December 04, 2019Order Vacating Judgment
Date: December 03, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 13, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: December 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissed
Judge: Bueltel, Joseph A. |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Index # 14
Judge: Bueltel, Joseph A. |
|
October 26, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 13
Judge: Bueltel, Joseph A. |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Bueltel, Joseph A. |
|
August 17, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 12
Judge: Bueltel, Joseph A. |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order
Judge: Bueltel, Joseph A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.