Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Steele County, MN, . Steele County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2015 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSteele County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 11 (Judicial Officer: Bueltel, Joseph A. )
Judge: Bueltel, Joseph A. |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 10 | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Bueltel, Joseph A.)
Judge: Bueltel, Joseph A. |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 9 | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 8 | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 5 | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Deficiency Index # 6 | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 4 | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Index # 3 | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.