Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Commitment Hearing filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2023 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 12 | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Distributed | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index # 11 | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 10 | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order-Other Index # 9 (Judicial Officer: Moehrle, Laura )
Judge: Moehrle, Laura |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 8 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 7 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.