Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Order Appointing Attorney Index # 13 filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 21 | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Waiver Index # 20 | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Visitor's Report Index # 19 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 18 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Prior Background Index # 17 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 16 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 15 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 14 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney Index # 13 (Judicial Officer: Hennesy, Sarah E. )
Judge: Hennesy, Sarah E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.