Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Commitment Hearing filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Termination of jurisdiction | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Provisional Discharge Index # 50 | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Change of Status Report Index # 49 | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 48 | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Change of Status Report Index # 47 | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 46 | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Transport Index # 45 (Judicial Officer: Kundrat, Frank J. )
Judge: Kundrat, Frank J. |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other Index # 44 | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 43 | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 42 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.