Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Default Hearing filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Davick-Halfen, Kris presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution Index # 36
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 35 (Judicial Officer: Davick-Halfen, Kris )
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dissolution Granted - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Davick-Halfen, Kris)
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution Index # 34 (Judicial Officer: Davick-Halfen, Kris )
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Clerk Minutes Index # 33
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Default Hearing Index # 31
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Order Index # 32
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Index # 30
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Clerk Minutes Index # 28
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 29
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.