Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Amended Support Order filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Davick-Halfen, Kris presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 87
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 86
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order-Other Index # 85 (Judicial Officer: Davick-Halfen, Kris )
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Order Index # 84
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 83
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 82
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing (Judicial Officer: Davick-Halfen, Kris )
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Davick-Halfen, Kris |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.