Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Motion Hearing filed a(n) Support case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2017 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 25 | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Child Support Index # 24 (Judicial Officer: Tollefson, Daniel A. )
Judge: Tollefson, Daniel A. |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Support order (Judicial Officer: Tollefson, Daniel A.)
Judge: Tollefson, Daniel A. |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 23 (Judicial Officer: Tollefson, Daniel A. )
Judge: Tollefson, Daniel A. |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 21 | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Expedited Process | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Submissions-Under Advisement Index # 22 (Judicial Officer: Tollefson, Daniel A. )
Judge: Tollefson, Daniel A. |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 20 | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Clerical Correction-Child Support Index # 19 | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.