Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index # 16 | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Interpreter Index # 15 | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 14 | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 13 | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index # 12 | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Change of name granted Party( Sanyi, Hamza ) | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 11 | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Name Change Index # 10 (Judicial Officer: Pearson, Andrew R. )
Judge: Pearson, Andrew R. |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index # 9 | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Interpreter Index # 8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.